OR SB131 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Effective date, July 27, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Effective date, July 27, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on the Willamette Falls Navigation Canal and Locks. Directs task force to study issues relating to repair, reopening and operation of canal and locks. Requires task force to make quarterly reports to Legislative Assembly. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Willamette Falls navigation canal and locks; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Devlin [D] | Rep. Brent Barton [D] | Rep. Julie Parrish [R] | Sen. Alan Olsen [R] |
Rep. John Davis [R] | Sen. Bill Kennemer [R] | Rep. Tobias Read [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the bill and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the bill and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | Senate | Effective date, July 27, 2015. |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Chapter 770, 2015 Laws. |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-07-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Barker, Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2015-06-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to July 1, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-06-29 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-24 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-24 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 28; absent, 1--Beyer; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation, then Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |