OR SB125 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of State Lands to study and make recommendations to interim committee of Legislative Assembly regarding establishment of publicly owned state research forest. Requires Department of State Lands to study and make recommendations to interim committee of Legislative Assembly regarding establishment of publicly owned state research forest. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a publicly owned state research forest; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB125 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB125/Introduced |