OR SB123 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs producer responsibility organization to consider and develop recommendations for use of digital labeling to convey information about recyclability claims and include recommendations in producer responsibility program plan or plan amendment no later than December 31, 2027. Requires Department of Environmental Quality to study recyclability claims. Directs department to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to environment not later than September 15, 2024.] Directs producer responsibility organization to consider and develop recommendations for use of digital labeling to convey information about recyclability claims and include recommendations in producer responsibility program plan or plan amendment no later than December 31, 2027. Sunsets January 2, 2033.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to recyclability claims.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-30SenateEffective date, January 1, 2024.
2023-05-26SenateChapter 100, 2023 Laws.
2023-05-19SenateGovernor signed.
2023-05-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-05-15SenatePresident signed.
2023-05-09HouseThird reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 20--Boice, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Cramer, Diehl, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Javadi, Levy B, Lewis, McIntire, Morgan, Osborne, Reschke, Scharf, Stout, Wright; Excused, 1--Bynum; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Conrad, Speaker Rayfield.
2023-05-08HouseSecond reading.
2023-05-04HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-05-03HouseWork Session held.
2023-04-24HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-04-13HouseReferred to Climate, Energy, and Environment.
2023-04-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-04-11SenateThird reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 7--Bonham, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Thatcher.
2023-04-10SenateCarried over to 04-11 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-06SenateCarried over to 04-10 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-05SenateCarried over to 04-06 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-04SenateSecond reading.
2023-04-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2023-03-30SenateWork Session held.
2023-03-28SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-12SenateReferred to Energy and Environment.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB123
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB123/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB123/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB123/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB123/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23624
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23920
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77015
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/66101
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77049
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77230
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267412
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267987
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267411
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267976
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267979
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267977
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77446
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270789
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271546
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78928
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34951
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=572429
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35507
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=578248

Bill Comments

feedback