OR SB123 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that employer is not in violation of pay equity requirements for paying different level of compensation to employee for modified work in certain circumstances. Provides that employer is not in violation of pay equity requirements for paying different level of compensation to employee who is performing] for modified work in certain circumstances. Provides that employer may pay employees for work of comparable character at different compensation levels on basis of certain factors contained in collective bargaining agreement. Provides that equal pay analysis demonstrating employer's pay practices in good faith in civil action include review of certain employer practices. Requires court to order employer to eliminate unlawful wage differential for prevailing plaintiff and award back pay or unpaid wages as provided under state laws that provide for right of civil action against employer for violation of pay equity requirements. Provides that evidence that employer has increased employee's pay as result of pay equity analysis may not be considered admission of liability in civil action.
Title
Relating to unlawful employment practices.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Rules (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Rules (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Chapter 617, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Leif. |
2019-06-17 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-06-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2019-05-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |