OR SB117 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Public Utility Commission to set by rule certain civil penalty amounts, not to exceed civil penalties set by applicable federal law. Authorizes Public Utility Commission to set by rule certain civil penalty amounts, not to exceed civil penalties set by applicable federal law.
Title
Relating to pipeline safety enforcement.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 35, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-05-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-11 | House | Third reading. Carried by Moore-Green. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Levy, Lively, Nearman. |
2021-05-10 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-14 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-03-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Heard. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |