OR SB117 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Jurisdictional Transfers. Sunsets task force on December 31, 2016. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to highways; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |