OR SB112 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, June 1, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, June 1, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that common law employees are employees for purposes of Public Employees Retirement System. Provides that common law employees are employees for purposes of Public Employees Retirement System. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to public employee retirement; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, June 1, 2021. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 136, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 21--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Nearman, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 3--Evans, Helm, Sanchez. |
2021-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 19, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-17 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-04-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 6--Boquist, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Manning Jr, Thomsen. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |