OR SB111 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to public employee retirement. Modifies provisions relating to public employee retirement.
Title
Relating to public employee retirement.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 135, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Grayber. Passed. Ayes, 46; Nays, 11--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Levy, Morgan, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Wallan; Excused, 3--Evans, Helm, Sanchez. |
2021-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 19, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-17 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-04-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 6--Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |