OR SB111 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits school district or public charter school from advancing student beyond third grade if student is not reading at or above third grade level. Requires that written notice be provided to parent or guardian. Allows waiver under specified circumstances. Allows student achievement grants to be used for intervention techniques and other programs or techniques that assist student in improving student's reading grade level. Takes effect July 1, 2016.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to student reading grade level; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-06SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2015-01-20SenateReferred to Education.
2015-01-12SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback