OR SB111 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires regulation of bodywork in same manner that law currently regulates massage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of bodywork; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-08SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2013-02-11SenatePublic Hearing held.
2013-01-18SenateReferred to Health Care and Human Services.
2013-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback