OR SB111 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to audio newspaper services for persons with disabilities; declaring an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to audio newspaper services for persons with disabilities; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-30 In committee upon adjournment.
2011-03-17 Referred to Ways and Means.
2011-03-17 Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage but w/amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng)
2011-03-14 Work Session held.
2011-02-14 Public Hearing held.
2011-01-14 Referred to Health Care, Human Services and Rural Health Policy.
2011-01-10 Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback