OR SB110 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals sunset on early discussion and resolution program for resolving adverse health care incidents. Repeals sunset on early discussion and resolution program for resolving adverse health care incidents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to resolving adverse health care events.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-04HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-03SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-01HouseThird reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 2--Clem, Evans; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Drazan, Holvey, Rayfield, Speaker Kotek.
2021-05-28HouseCarried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-05-27HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-26HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-25HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-25HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-20HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-28HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-26HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-07HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-03-17SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-03-17SenateThird reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Heard.
2021-03-11SenateSecond reading.
2021-03-11SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-02-24SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-01SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Health Care.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback