OR SB1093 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs presiding judge of each judicial district to develop and implement coordinated public safety unrepresented defendant crisis plan, and submit plan to Oregon Criminal Justice Commission, by specified date. Directs presiding judge of each judicial district to develop and implement coordinated public safety unrepresented defendant crisis plan, and submit plan to Oregon Criminal Justice Commission, by specified date. Directs presiding judge of judicial district of certain population to convene crisis team to assist in developing and implementing plan. Directs Public Defense Services Commission to promulgate and disseminate guidance on crisis plans, develop training plan concerning unrepresented defendant crisis and report to legislature by specified date. Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to report to legislature on crisis plan findings by specified date. Appropriates moneys to Public Defense Services Commission for implementing crisis plans. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public defense; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-05-03SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-04-25SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
2023-04-21SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2023-04-20SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback