OR SB109 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs State Parks and Recreation Commission to adopt rules managing use of unmanned aircraft systems by people in state parks. Directs State Parks and Recreation Commission to adopt rules managing use of unmanned aircraft systems by people in state parks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to use of unmanned aircraft systems in state parks.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03SenateGovernor signed.
2021-05-27HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-05-26SenatePresident signed.
2021-05-25HouseThird reading. Carried by Helm. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 5--Morgan, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Stark; Excused, 1--Hayden; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bynum.
2021-05-24HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-20HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-19HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-18HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-13HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-29HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-27HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-07HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-03-17SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-03-17SenateThird reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 5--Boquist, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Thomsen.
2021-03-11SenateSecond reading.
2021-03-11SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-02-22SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2021-02-01SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback