OR SB1075 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Education to establish school media program standards and provide technical assistance related to those standards. Directs Department of Education to establish school media program standards and provide technical assistance related to those standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to school media programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-04-11SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2023-04-11SenateRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2023-04-04SenateWork Session held.
2023-03-30SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Education, then Ways and Means.
2023-02-27SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB1075
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1075/Introduced
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74791
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76521
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268347
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269603
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77525
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269866
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269867
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78232
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35189

Bill Comments

feedback