OR SB1074 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Health Authority to administer two-year demonstration project in two counties to test whether expanding scope of compensable services provided by community health workers can improve outcomes for low-income families and children at risk of entering foster care system. Directs Oregon Health Authority to administer two-year demonstration project in two counties to test whether expanding scope of compensable services provided by community health workers can improve outcomes for low-income families and children at risk of entering foster care system. Sunsets January 2, 2028. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to community health worker services; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Deb Patterson [D] | Rep. Ed Diehl [R] | Rep. Kevin Mannix [R] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Health Care, then Ways and Means. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |