OR SB107 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies definition of "Class IV all-terrain vehicle." Removes requirement that certain off-road vehicles be equipped with windshield wipers. Modifies definition of "Class IV all-terrain vehicle." Removes requirement that certain off-road vehicles be equipped with windshield wipers.
Title
Relating to off-road vehicles.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB107 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB107/Introduced |