OR SB1055 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes suspension of requirement of showing proficiency in Essential Learning Skills as condition of earning diploma. Removes suspension of requirement of showing proficiency in Essential Learning Skills as condition of earning diploma. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to high school graduation requirements; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Withdraw from Committee (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-04-25SenateMotion to withdraw from committee on Education failed. Ayes, 13; Nays, 16--Campos, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser Blouin, Golden, Jama, Lieber, Manning Jr, Meek, Patterson, Prozanski, Sollman, Steiner, Taylor, Woods, President Wagner; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Education.
2023-02-27SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback