OR SB1053 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes TriMet Crash Advisory Committee. Provides that committee shall review certain crashes involving TriMet vehicles that result in injury or fatality and make reports to TriMet's board of directors as needed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the TriMet Crash Advisory Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-30HouseThird reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Clem, Noble, Sprenger, Wallan.
2019-06-29HouseRules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 30, 2019 Calendar.
2019-06-29HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-29HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-06-29HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-29HouseReferred to Rules.
2019-06-29HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-06-29SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist.
2019-06-29SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-29SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-06-20SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-06-18SenateReferred to Rules.
2019-06-18SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback