OR SB1049 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, June 11, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Redirects portion of employee contributions of member of Public Employees Retirement System to employee pension stability account. Directs Public Employees Retirement Board to study issues relating to Public Employees Retirement System and report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2020.] Directs Public Employees Retirement Board to apply amounts in account to pay costs of pension or other retirement benefits payable to member that accrue on or after July 1, 2020. Allows certain participating public employer making lump sum payment of employer contributions to choose year in which to begin using lump sum payment to offset employer contributions required of employer. Modifies provisions relating to pension obligation bonds. Directs board, in year 2019, to determine liabilities attributable to benefits to be provided to Tier 1 and 2 members and set employer contribution rates to ensure that liabilities will be funded 22 years after determination. Modifies provisions relating to investment options available under individual account program. Eliminates restrictions on reemployment of retired members of system until December 31, 2024. Requires employer of retired member to make additional employer contribution to system. Beginning in 2020, caps at $195,000 annual salary used to calculate final average salary for purposes of system. Transfers proceeds of sports betting games to Employer Incentive Fund. Modifies provisions relating to Employer Incentive Fund, School Districts Unfunded Liability Fund and Unfunded Actuarial Liability Resolution Program. Requires board to report to Joint Committee on Ways and Means or Joint Interim Committee on Ways and Means on proposed changes to actuarial methods and assumptions. Appropriates moneys for deposit in Employer Incentive Fund to match certain employer contributions. Provides for expedited review of Act by Supreme Court upon petition by adversely affected party. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public employee retirement; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17SenateEffective date, June 11, 2019.
2019-06-17SenateChapter 355, 2019 Laws.
2019-06-11SenateGovernor signed.
2019-06-04HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-03SenatePresident signed.
2019-05-30HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Alonso Leon, Bynum, Keny-Guyer, McLain, Meek, Mitchell, Neron, Piluso, Prusak, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Wilde, Williams, Williamson.
2019-05-30HouseThird reading as Special Order of Business. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 31; Nays, 29--Barker, Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Clem, Doherty, Drazan, Evans, Findley, Gorsek, Hayden, Helt, Hernandez, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Prusak, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika.
2019-05-30HouseRules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on May 30, 2019 Calendar.
2019-05-29HouseSecond reading.
2019-05-29HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-05-29HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-05-28HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-05-23SenateVote explanation filed by Prozanski.
2019-05-23SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 12--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Fagan, Gelser, Golden, Heard, Linthicum, Taylor, Thatcher, Thomsen, Wagner; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters.
2019-05-23SenateSecond reading.
2019-05-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-05-21SenateWork Session held.
2019-05-21SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2019-05-21SenateWork Session held.
2019-05-15SenatePossible Work Session cancelled.
2019-05-14SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-05-07SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2019-05-06SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-05-06SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback