OR SB1047 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Raises contract price threshold under which contracting agency may apply certain solicitation and procurement methods for public contracts. Raises contract price threshold under which contracting agency may apply certain solicitation and procurement methods for public contracts. Requires state contracting agency that awards public contract with contract price of $10,000 or more to document in state contracting agency's procurement file actions that state contracting agency takes to provide notice of procurement to Governor's Policy Advisor for Economic and Business Equity and to invite or consider for participation in procurement businesses or enterprises that Certification Office for Business Inclusion and Diversity certifies. Requires Oregon Department of Administrative Services to promote policy of diversity, equity and inclusion in public contracting by engaging in efforts to increase public contracting opportunities for businesses and enterprises that Certification Office for Business Inclusion and Diversity has certified. Requires department to review and evaluate results of disparity study, to develop plan to implement and implement priority recommendations of study and to report periodically to Governor's Policy Advisor for Economic and Business Equity concerning progress of department's plan and implementation. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to equity in public procurements; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-02SenateEffective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
2023-06-02SenateChapter 127, 2023 Laws.
2023-05-30SenateGovernor signed.
2023-05-23HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-05-18SenatePresident signed.
2023-05-16HouseThird reading. Carried by Grayber. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 18--Boice, Boshart Davis, Cate, Cramer, Diehl, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Levy B, Lewis, McIntire, Morgan, Osborne, Reschke, Scharf, Stout, Wright; Excused, 2--Breese-Iverson, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Rayfield.
2023-05-15HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-11HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-09HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-08HouseSecond reading.
2023-05-04HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-05-03HouseWork Session held.
2023-04-26HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-04-13HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2023-04-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-04-10SenateThird reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 9--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher, Weber; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Hansell.
2023-04-06SenateCarried over to 04-10 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-05SenateCarried over to 04-06 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-04SenateCarried over to 04-05 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-03SenateCarried over to 04-04 by unanimous consent.
2023-03-30SenateSecond reading.
2023-03-30SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-03-28SenateWork Session held.
2023-03-23SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Labor and Business.
2023-02-27SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB1047
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1047/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1047/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24649
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76237
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74764
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76512
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76888
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266910
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265996
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267400
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271675
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271786
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271814
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272223
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78932
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34836
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=572164
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35485
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=579831

Bill Comments

feedback