OR SB1046 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies age range for purposes of protection from age discrimination in place of public accommodation. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to minimum age restrictions in places of public accommodation; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2019-05-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |