OR SB1042 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Policy Board to produce and provide to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health by December 31, 2024, comprehensive report regarding success in achieving aims of Oregon Integrated and Coordinated Health Care Delivery System. Requires Oregon Health Policy Board to produce and provide to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health by December 31, 2024, comprehensive report regarding success in achieving aims of Oregon Integrated and Coordinated Health Care Delivery System. Modifies membership of board and specifies duties of chairperson of board. Requires appointment of executive director. Increases oversight and supervision responsibilities of board over Oregon Health Authority. Requires board to submit agency request budget for board. Puts Health Evidence Review Commission under auspices of board.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Health Policy Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Health Care, then Ways and Means. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |