OR SB1040 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, June 14, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, June 14, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ensures that private sector labor organizations and employers throughout state may enter into union security agreements to full extent allowed by federal law. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to union security agreements; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Effective date, June 14, 2017. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Chapter 369, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed.Ayes, 41; Nays, 17--Barreto, Bentz, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 2--Boone, Meek. |
2017-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 31, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-15 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-10 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-04-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed.Ayes, 17; nays, 12--Boquist, DeBoer, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Made a Special Order of Business by voice vote. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |