OR SB1037 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Transformational Resilience Task Force. Directs task force to research psychological, emotional and psychosocial resilience education and skills training. Requires task force to submit report on findings to committees of Legislative Assembly no later than May 2, 2022. Sunsets June 30, 2022.
Title
Relating to resiliency education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness, then Ways and Means. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |