OR SB1030 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Judicial Department, in collaboration with Public Defense Services Commission, to study child welfare investigations and improvements necessary to align rights and procedural protections of parents and children involved in child welfare investigations with those afforded to defendants in criminal proceedings. Requires Judicial Department, in collaboration with Public Defense Services Commission, to study child welfare investigations and improvements necessary to align rights and procedural protections of parents and children involved in child welfare investigations with those afforded to defendants in criminal proceedings. Directs department, in collaboration with Public Defense Services Commission, to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary not later than September 15, 2024. Modifies offense of making false report of child abuse. Punishes first offense by maximum of 364 days' imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both. Punishes second or subsequent offense by maximum of five years' imprisonment, $125,000 fine, or both. Creates civil cause of action for false report of child abuse.
Title
Relating to child welfare investigations.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] | Rep. James Hieb [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Withdraw from Committee (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Sollman. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on Human Services failed. Ayes, 13; Nays, 15--Campos, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser Blouin, Golden, Jama, Lieber, Manning Jr, Meek, Patterson, Sollman, Steiner, Taylor, Woods, President Wagner; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Prozanski. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |