OR SB102 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Effective date, August 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Effective date, August 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Adoption Applicable Child Savings Fund for deposit of federal applicable child savings from adoption assistance payments. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to Adoption Applicable Child Savings Fund; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-07-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-10 | Senate | Effective date, August 2, 2017. |
2017-08-10 | Senate | Chapter 637, 2017 Laws. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-07 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Malstrom. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2017-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to July 7, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-07-06 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-07-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, then Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |