OR SB1018 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Deaf, Deaf-Blind and Hard of Hearing Program within Department of Human Services. Establishes Oregon Deaf, Deaf-Blind and Hard of Hearing Committee for purpose of advising department on implementing and administering program. Specifies components of program and duties of department and committee. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Takes effect 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to hearing; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, then Ways and Means. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |