OR SB1012 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Secretary of State to ensure that there is at least one official ballot drop site at each public high school and on campus of each school of higher education. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Secretary of State for purpose of hiring individuals to assist with new drop sites. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to student voting; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Rep. Philip Barnhart [D] |
Rep. Diego Hernandez [D] | Rep. Karin Power [D] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB1012 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1012/Introduced |