OR SB1010 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Liquor and Cannabis Commission to study options available for use of marijuana tax revenues for funding law enforcement programs directed at cannabis-related offenses. Requires Oregon Liquor and Cannabis Commission to study options available for use of marijuana tax revenues for funding law enforcement programs directed at cannabis-related offenses. Directs commission to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to revenue not later than September 15, 2024.
Title
Relating to use of marijuana tax revenues for law enforcement purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Virgle Osborne [R] | Rep. Lily Morgan [R] | Rep. Anna Scharf [R] |
Rep. Boomer Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate Withdraw from Committee (Y: 12 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on Judiciary failed. Ayes, 12; Nays, 15--Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser Blouin, Golden, Jama, Lieber, Manning Jr, Meek, Patterson, Prozanski, Sollman, Steiner, Taylor, Woods, President Wagner; Excused, 3--Campos, Findley, Gorsek. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |