OR SB101 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies eligibility requirements and grant amounts for educational grants to members of Oregon National Guard. Modifies eligibility requirements and grant amounts for educational grants to members of Oregon National Guard. Authorizes Higher Education Coordinating Commission to modify eligibility requirements or decrease grant amounts based on availability of funding.
Title
Relating to educational grants for members of the Oregon National Guard.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 268, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-01 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Dexter. |
2021-06-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Grayber. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 2--Clem, Evans; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Holvey, Rayfield, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-05-28 | House | Carried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-24 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Management. |
2021-04-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 4--Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |