OR SB1008 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to crime; declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to crime; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2010-02-10 | Motion to rerefer to Judiciary carried on voice vote. | |
2010-02-09 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-08 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng). | |
2010-02-08 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-02 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2010-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |