OR SB1003 | 2010 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Effective date, March 18, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to association health plans; and declaring an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to association health plans; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-18 Effective date, March 18, 2010.
2010-03-18 Chapter 81, 2010 Laws.
2010-03-18 Governor signed.
2010-03-10 Speaker signed.
2010-03-04 President signed.
2010-02-24 Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Harker.
2010-02-24 Third reading. Carried by Nolan. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Kahl, Schaufler.
2010-02-23 Second reading.
2010-02-22 Recommendation: Do pass.
2010-02-22 Public Hearing and Work Session held.
2010-02-19 Referred to Rules by order of Speaker.
2010-02-19 Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
2010-02-18 Work Session held.
2010-02-17 Work Session held.
2010-02-15 Public Hearing held.
2010-02-10 Referred to Health Care.
2010-02-08 First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2010-02-05 Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Bates, Boquist, George.
2010-02-04 Second reading.
2010-02-04 Recommendation: Do pass.
2010-02-02 Public Hearing and Work Session held.
2010-02-01 Referred to Health Care.
2010-02-01 Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback