OR SB1000 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adds new entity eligible to receive grant funds to provide services to refugees and adds new categories of refugees eligible for assistance. Adds new entity eligible to receive grant funds to provide services to refugees and adds new categories of refugees eligible for assistance. Requires Department of Human Services to provide grantees with funding for specified services related to housing. Requires department to hire full-time State Refugee Coordinator and Refugee Housing Coordinator. Appropriates moneys to department to carry out new requirements. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to refugees; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-02-24SenateReferred to Human Services, then Ways and Means.
2023-02-22SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback