OR SB1000 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to veterans.
Title
Relating to veterans.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Effective date, January 1, 2011. | |
2010-03-10 | Chapter 61, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-10 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-25 | President signed. | |
2010-02-24 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Cowan. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 1--Beyer; Absent, 1--Roblan; Excused, 2--Kahl, Schaufler; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Berger, Frederick, Gelser, Kotek, Tomei. | |
2010-02-24 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2010-02-22 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2010-02-22 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | |
2010-02-22 | Third reading. Carried by Schrader. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 2--Burdick, Metsger; excused, 1--Morrisette. | |
2010-02-20 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-20 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2010-02-17 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. | |
2010-02-05 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2010-02-04 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-02 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Veterans Affairs. | |
2010-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |