OR SB1 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes System of Care Advisory Council to provide forum for statewide system of care policy development and planning. Directs council to develop and maintain state system of care policy and comprehensive, long-range plan for coordinated system of care. Directs council to update plan biennially and submit plan to interim committee of Legislative Assembly and Governor. Directs council to make annual reports and recommend legislation to interim committee of Legislative Assembly and Governor. Directs council to make recommendations to Director of Oregon Health Authority, Director of Oregon Youth Authority and Director of Human Services regarding systems of care. Authorizes] Directs council to award grants to support local system of care governance and carry out recommendations in council's long-range plan for coordinated system of care. Directs council to create Children's System Data Dashboard regarding youths being served by Oregon Youth Authority, Oregon Health Authority and Department of Human Services. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to council for biennial expenses related to council.] Authorizes Department of Human Services, Oregon Health Authority and Oregon Youth Authority to contract with providers to establish interdisciplinary assessment teams to provide services to youth. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Health Authority for biennial expenses related to interdisciplinary assessment teams.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.].
Title
Relating to youth with specialized needs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Chapter 616, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 7--Clem, Greenlick, Hernandez, McKeown, Noble, Smith DB, Wallan. |
2019-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-29 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, then Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |