OR SB1 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates income tax credit for operation costs of housing for agricultural workers. Provides for refundability of credit and for transferability of credit earned by tax-exempt entity. Imposes limitation on total credits allowed to all owners of housing per tax year. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2018, and before January 1, 2024. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to tax credits for housing agricultural workers; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-07SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2017-03-21SenateRecommendation: Without recommendation as to passage rescind subsequent referral to Tax Credits and be referred to Ways and Means. Request denied by Order of the President and referred to Tax Credits by prior reference.
2017-03-21SenateWork Session held.
2017-03-09SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-01-17SenateReferred to Finance and Revenue, then Tax Credits.
2017-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback