OR HR1 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Resolves that House of Representatives finds that Representative Diego Hernandez engaged in disorderly behavior. Directs Legislative Equity Officer to study Legislative Branch Personnel Rule 27 procedures and make recommendations on procedure improvements to House Committee on Conduct.] Resolves that House of Representatives finds that Representative Diego Hernandez engaged in disorderly behavior. Further resolves that, with concurrence of two-thirds of members of House of Representatives, Representative Hernandez be expelled from House of Representatives.
Title
Resolving that House of Representatives finds Representative Diego Hernandez engaged in disorderly behavior and expels Representative Hernandez.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-16 | House | Rules suspended. Motion to rerefer to Conduct carried. Rereferred. |
2021-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 16, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-02-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 2, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-02-16 | House | Carried over to February 23, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-02-11 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-02-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Conduct. |
2021-02-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |