OR HJR5 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to repeal provision requiring inmates in corrections institutions to engage in full-time work or on-the-job training. Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to repeal provision requiring inmates in corrections institutions to engage in full-time work or on-the-job training. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to inmate labor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to adoption and be referred to Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-07 | House | Without recommendation as to adoption and be referred to Rules. |
2021-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |