OR HJR203 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution establishing obligation of state to ensure every resident of state access to cost-effective, medically appropriate and affordable health care. Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution establishing obligation of state to ensure every resident of state access to effective] cost-effective, medically appropriate and affordable health care. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to obligation of state to ensure access to health care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-19SenatePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Health Care.
2018-02-14SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-13HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
2018-02-13HouseRead. Carried by Greenlick. Adopted. Ayes, 35; Nays, 25--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Buehler, Esquivel, Findley, Hayden, Heard, Helfrich, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson.
2018-02-09HouseSubsequent referral to Rules rescinded by order of the Speaker.
2018-02-09HouseRecommendation: Be adopted with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Rules be rescinded.
2018-02-07HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Rules.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback