OR HJR201 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to allow municipal corporations to use certain bonded indebtedness to finance capital costs of affordable housing, with certain limitations. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to affordable housing.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted and refer to Rules by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted and refer to Rules by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Winters. Adopted. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt the A-Eng. resolution. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Rules by prior reference. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted and be referred to Rules by prior reference. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, then Rules. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-19 | House | Read. Carried by Nearman, Meek. Adopted. Ayes, 54; Excused, 2--McKeown, Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Helfrich, Nathanson, Piluso, Wilson. |
2018-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 19, 2018 Calendar. |
2018-02-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 16, 2018 Calendar. |
2018-02-13 | House | Subsequent referral to Rules rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2018-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Rules be rescinded. |
2018-02-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Rules. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |