OR HJR20 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes revision of Oregon Constitution to authorize imposition of local option ad valorem property taxes outside certain constitutional limitations and to require enactment of property tax relief program to freeze assessed value of homesteads of certain seniors and individuals with disabilities at assessed value on date claim is filed. Refers proposed revision to people for their approval or rejection at next primary election.
Title
Proposing revision of Oregon Constitution relating to property taxation; and requiring approval by a two-thirds majority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-05-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Rules. |
2015-02-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HJR20 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HJR20/Introduced |