OR HJR15 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Public Hearing and Possible Work Session scheduled.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Hearing: Apr 23 @ 3:00 pm in HR B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs state agencies to follow Childhood and Early Parenting Principles as framework for policies and programs for early parenting and early childhood development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directing state agencies to follow Childhood and Early Parenting Principles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 41 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenatePublic Hearing and Possible Work Session scheduled.
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Human Services.
2019-04-08SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-04-04HouseRead. Carried by Marsh. Adopted. Ayes, 41; Nays, 15--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Leif, McLane, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Sprenger, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 2--Keny-Guyer, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Smith Warner, Williamson.
2019-04-03HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2019-03-27HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Education.
2019-01-22HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback