OR HJR100 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-25 - Failed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-25 - Failed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to obligation of state to ensure access to effective, medically appropriate and affordable health care.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to obligation of state to ensure access to effective, medically appropriate and affordable health care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Failed. | |
2010-02-12 | Read. Carried by Greenlick. Failed. Ayes, 30; Nays, 28--Barton, Bentz, Bruun, Cameron, Doherty, Esquivel, Freeman, Garrard, Gilliam, Gilman, Hanna, Huffman, Jenson, Kennemer, Krieger, Matthews, Maurer, Olson, Richardson, Schaufler, Smith G., Sprenger, Stiegler, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Wingard; Absent, 1--Tomei; Excused, 1--Berger. | |
2010-02-11 | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 12, 2010 Calendar. | |
2010-02-10 | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 11, 2010 Calendar. | |
2010-02-09 | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 10, 2010 Calendar. | |
2010-02-08 | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-04 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Health Care. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |