OR HJM5 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to continue to appropriate funds for Hanford Nuclear Reservation cleanup, with specific focus on funding for expansion of existing ground water treatment systems.
Title
Urging Congress to continue to appropriate funds for Hanford Nuclear Reservation cleanup, with a specific focus on funding for expansion of existing ground water treatment systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Dembrow. Adopted.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt the A-Eng. memorial. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-06 | House | Read. Carried by Holvey. Adopted.Ayes, 53; Nays, 2--Nearman, Post; Excused, 5--Boone, Gorsek, Hack, Hayden, Malstrom. |
2017-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 4, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-03-29 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 3, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-03-29 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-03-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2017-02-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |