OR HJM3 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to support qualification board's proposed changes to qualification requirements for real estate appraisers.
Title
Urging Congress to support qualifications board's proposed changes to qualification requirements for real estate appraisers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Girod. Adopted.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt the A-Eng. memorial. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-12 | House | Read. Carried by Gomberg. Adopted.Ayes, 55; Nays, 3--Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 2--Boone, Lewis. |
2017-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-03 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-03-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |