OR HJM3 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to support marketing of Oregon seafood.
Title
Urging Congress to support marketing of Oregon seafood.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-05-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Roblan. Adopted. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Beyer, Johnson, Kruse. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Rural Communities and Economic Development. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-03-12 | House | Read. Carried by Boone. Adopted. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Barton, Matthews, Read, Weidner. |
2013-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 12, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 11, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-03-06 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-03-05 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |