OR HJM14 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-29 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-29 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to enact legislation permitting negotiation of drug prices and rebates on behalf of Medicare recipients.
Title
Urging Congress to enact legislation permitting negotiation of drug prices and rebates on behalf of Medicare recipients.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-29 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-05-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Kruse. Adopted. Ayes, 30. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-05-02 | House | Read. Carried by Buckley. Adopted. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Davis, Lively, Read, Speaker Kotek. |
2013-05-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 1, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-29 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 30, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 29, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 25, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 23, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 22, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-04-12 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-08 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2013-03-07 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |