OR HJM1 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-05 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-05 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to overturn United States Department of Veterans Affairs regulation prohibiting provision of service or therapy dogs for veterans with emotional and mental disabilities.
Title
Urging Congress to overturn regulation prohibiting provision of service or therapy dogs for veterans with emotional and mental disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-05 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Olsen. Adopted. Ayes, 30. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-02-25 | House | Read. Carried by Esquivel. Adopted. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Barton, Freeman, Thatcher, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Tomei. |
2013-02-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 25, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-02-20 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-02-19 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Veterans' Services and Emergency Preparedness. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |