OR HCR8 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

In memoriam: Mary Katherine "Kappy" Eaton, 1924-2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In memoriam: Mary Katherine "Kappy" Eaton.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Special Order (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseFiled with Secretary of State.
2019-05-15SenatePresident signed.
2019-05-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-05-14SenateFinal reading. Carried by Prozanski. Adopted. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters.
2019-05-13SenateSecond reading.
2019-05-13SenateRecommendation: Be adopted.
2019-05-06SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-04-30SenateReferred to Rules.
2019-04-29SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-04-25HouseRead as Special Order of Business. Carried by Nathanson. Adopted. Ayes, 60.
2019-01-30HouseRules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on April 25, 2019 Calendar.
2019-01-30HouseRules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on April 29, 2019 Calendar.
2019-01-29HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2019-01-28HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Rules.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback